Solnik, Manny Charles (CPSO#: 43270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Nov 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 273-3176
Fax: (905) 848-1500
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manny Charles Solnik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Solnik ( CPSO# 43270 )

Business Address:
Suite 500
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 273-3176

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANNY CHARLES SOLNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLNIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1985