Solomon, Leigh (CPSO#: 52416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Psychiatry
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6655 Ext. 6646
Fax: (416) 756-6671
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Peltz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Solomon ( CPSO# 52416 )
Dr. L. Peltz ( CPSO# 52415 )
Dr. S. Peltz ( CPSO# 100394)

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6600

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4426

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEIGH SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1984