Solomon, Leslie Vasile (CPSO#: 25793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1483 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 1E1
Phone: (905) 523-1616
Fax: (905) 523-6114
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leslie Solomon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Solomon ( CPSO# 25793 )

Business Address:
1483 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1E1
Phone Number: (905) 523-6114

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE VASILE SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1973