Solomon, Mark Anthony Andrew (CPSO#: 51822)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Aug 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Aix-Marseille II, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Aug 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 26, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Mark Solomon was subject to investigations by the College into allegations regarding inappropriate conduct, including kissing two patients. During the course of the College's investigations and without these allegations having been adjudicated, Dr. Solomon resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.