Solow, Henry Lucius (CPSO#: 54171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7072
Fax: (905) 472-0529
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Henry Solow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tobin ( CPSO# 56983 )
Dr. H. Solow ( CPSO# 54171 )

Business Address:
Suite 407
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7072

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY LUCIUS SOLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1985