Solsberg, Murray David (CPSO#: 57493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3601 South Pearl Street
Englewood CO  80113
United States
Phone: (303) 762-0060
Fax: (303) 762-1131

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Colorado
USA - Kansas
USA - Oklahoma
USA - Texas

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY DAVID SOLSBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLSBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987