Somal, Kirandeep (CPSO#: 90323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Oak Medical
200-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 582-7533
Fax: (905) 582-0766
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kirandeep Somal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Somal ( CPSO# 90323 )

Business Address:
West Oak Medical
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 582-7533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRANDEEP SOMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2009 to 06 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2014