Somani, Arif (CPSO#: 66697)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arif Somani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster Children's Hospital 1200 Main Street West Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1998 to 31 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017