Somers, Andrea Denise (CPSO#: 78992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
R F E G S 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Somers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Somers ( CPSO# 78992 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
R F E G S 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA DENISE SOMERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2005