Somers, Gino Rene (CPSO#: 79747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 May 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Monash University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
Division of Pathology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6848
Fax: (416) 813-5974
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 06 May 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 May 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 May 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Gino Rene Somers may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Laboratory  Medicine  and  Pathobiology,  University of Toronto, in
                        which  Dr.  Somers  holds  a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or
                        research appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  will  automatically expire when Dr.  Somers  no  longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.