Somersall, Lee-Anne Alethea (CPSO#: 81252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Howard University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
89 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 273-4380
Fax: (905) 273-4335
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lee-Anne Somersall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Somersall ( CPSO# 81252 )

Business Address:
Suite 510
89 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 273-4380

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEE-ANNE ALETHEA SOMERSALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMERSALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006