Somme, Stig (CPSO#: 87629)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Oslo, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Aug 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 21 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009