Sommer, Doron Dov (CPSO#: 69231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
3V1 Clinic E N T
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73078
Fax: (905) 521-8552
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton General Hospital
3 Upper ENT Clinic
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46237
Fax: (905) 527-6860
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sommer Cogan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cogan ( CPSO# 70148 )
Dr. D. Sommer ( CPSO# 69231 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 351-3700

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
3V1 Clinic E N T
1200 Main Street West
Rosseau ON  L8S 4J9
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University (Hamilton General Hospital)
237 Barton Street East
3 - Upper E N T Clinic
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
Suite 305
1436 Royal York Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 240-1382

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORON DOV SOMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000