Sommer, Leeor Zeev (CPSO#: 75053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K1E1
Phone: (416)756-6882
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y2P9
Canada
Phone: (905)895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M5R1B5
Canada
Phone: (416)530-6004
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B1B8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sommer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sommer ( CPSO# 75053 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6882

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6004

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEEOR ZEEV SOMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002