Sommerauer, John Fred (CPSO#: 51821)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 1994