Sommers, Izzy (CPSO#: 20697)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2003