Son, William (CPSO#: 96264)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Son Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital, 327 Reynolds Street, Oakville, ON L6J 3L7
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2015