Sonbol, Soliman Moones (CPSO#: 63298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Dec 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario shores Ctr MentalHealth Sc
700 Gordon Street
P O Box 613
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (906) 668-5881 Ext. 6560
Fax: (905) 430-4032
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 210
1885 Glennana Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOLIMAN MOONES SONBOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONBOL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995