Song, Howard Ha-Il (CPSO#: 85004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Park Healthcare Centre
Tuberculosis Service
Respiratory Department, Rm 126
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone: (416) 243-3600 Ext. 2180
Fax: (416) 243-3696
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD HA-IL SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010