Song, John Jung-Hun (CPSO#: 58422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone: (905) 790-2880
Fax: (905) 790-1549
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Jong-Hun Song Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Song ( CPSO# 58422 )

Business Address:
204 - 40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 790-2880

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN JUNG-HUN SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1988