Soni, Deepa (CPSO#: 69942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Soni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soni ( CPSO# 69942 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEPA SONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1998