Soni, Nisha (CPSO#: 80855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1852 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 7Z8
Phone: (613) 526-5200
Fax: (613) 526-5207
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nisha Soni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Soni ( CPSO# 30386 )
Dr. N. Soni ( CPSO# 80855 )

Business Address:
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Phone Number: (613) 234-4641

Business Address:
1852 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 7Z8
Phone Number: (613) 526-5200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISHA SONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 07 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007