Sonnenberg, Brian Harald (CPSO#: 65481)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2012