Sontichai, Watchareewan (CPSO#: 113393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 16 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Chiang Mai University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Rheumatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 4168137707
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Thailand

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WATCHAREEWAN SONTICHAI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SONTICHAI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SONTICHAI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SONTICHAI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SONTICHAI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SONTICHAI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. SONTICHAI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Sep 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019