Soo, Grace Wan-Ping (CPSO#: 68176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Fukien, Malay

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Raffles Medical Group
21 Choa Chu Kang North 6
#01-02, Yew Tee Point
Singapore 689578
Singapore
Phone: +6566343132

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Singapore

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRACE WAN-PING SOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996