Soo, Stephanie May-Yin (CPSO#: 88387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
AMS Toronto
431 King Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1L5
Phone: (416) 368-6304
Fax: (416) 368-6638
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

AMS Toronto
247 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4L 3B4
Canada
Phone: (416) 466-6800
Fax: (416) 466-3700
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

AMS Toronto
2688 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4L 1L7
Canada
Phone: (416) 699-3000
Fax: (416) 699-3002
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE MAY-YIN SOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2010