Soo, Teck Mun (CPSO#: 65701)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Hakka, Malay, Mandarin

Education:University of Dublin, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 31 Dec 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Nov 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2012