Soo, Victoria (CPSO#: 87568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bowman Gray of Wake Forest University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 473-6654
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria Soo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Soo ( CPSO# 87568 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone Number: (519) 473-6654

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA SOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009