Soochan, Diana Caroline (CPSO#: 87483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7986
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana Soochan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soochan ( CPSO# 87483 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA CAROLINE SOOCHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOCHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jul 2007 to 10 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2015