Sood, Manish Micheal (CPSO#: 78018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82526
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital Research Institute
2-014 Administrative Services Build
Box 693
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 17176
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manish M. Sood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sood ( CPSO# 78018 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Research Institute
University of Ottawa
2-014 Administrative Sevices Building
Box 693 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANISH MICHEAL SOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013