Sood, Nidhi (CPSO#: 82639)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015