Sood, Om Prakash (CPSO#: 30695)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Agra University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006