Sookhai, Nicole Kavita (CPSO#: 86374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rexdale Community Health Centre
8 Taber Road
Etobicoke ON  M9W 3A4
Phone: (416) 744-0066
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

205 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9N 2L7
Canada
Phone: (416) 675-6622
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sookhai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sookhai ( CPSO# 86374 )

Business Address:
Rexdale Community Health Centre
8 Taber Road
Etobicoke ON  M9W 3A4
Phone Number: (416) 744-0066

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE KAVITA SOOKHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOKHAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009