Sooknanan, Avita (CPSO#: 88541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-3607
Fax: (905) 697-3645
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clarington Urgent Care Clinic
2320 Highway 2
Bowmanville ON  L1C 3K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 697-1466
Fax: (905) 697-9592
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Bowmanville Urgent Care Clinic
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-6458
Fax: (905) 623-6486
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Whitby Medical
Unit 4
3910 Brock Street North
Whitby ON  L1R 3E1
Canada
Phone: (905) 444-9493
Fax: (905) 444-9174
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVITA SOOKNANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOKNANAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010