Sookram, Sunil Mukeshwar (CPSO#: 72398)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 08 Aug 1998
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 1998 to 05 Sep 1998
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 1998