Soon, Gordon Stanley (CPSO#: 84575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6479
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Paediatrics
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6625
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. S. Soon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Soon ( CPSO# 84575 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Dept of Paediatrics
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 25 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON STANLEY SOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010