Soong, Daniel (CPSO#: 103682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone: (519) 396-6750
Fax: (877) 842-9922
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1199 Queen St. N
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G6
Canada
Phone: 519-396-3331
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

340 High St.
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 797-3230
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

21 McGivern St. W
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Canada
Phone: (519) 881-1220
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Soong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soong ( CPSO# 103682)

Business Address:
1201 Queen Street North
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone Number: (519) 396-2700

Business Address:
1199 Queen Street North
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G6
Phone Number: (519) 396-3331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL SOONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016