Soong, Patrick Yen (CPSO#: 66429)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 258-9484
Fax: (519) 258-9774
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 257-5112
Fax: (519) 257-5242
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK YEN SOONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1995