Sorensen, Anne Katherine (CPSO#: 66671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: Horsey, Anne Katherine (used until: 23 Mar 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oshawa Medical Centre
1400 Ritson Road North
Oshawa ON  L1G 7W4
Phone: (905) 579-8111
Fax: (905) 433-1838
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE KATHERINE SORENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SORENSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995