Sorensen, Ronald Bjorndahl (CPSO#: 30034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3405 Rhodes Drive
Windsor ON  N8W 5B3
Phone: (519) 974-8879
Fax: (519) 974-9261
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. B. Sorensen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sorensen ( CPSO# 30034 )

Business Address:
3405 Rhodes Drive
Windsor ON  N8W 5B3
Phone Number: (519) 974-8879

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Site
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 253-4559

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  January 11, 2010
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario received notice from Windsor Regional Hospital of a temporary suspension of privileges held by Dr. Ronald B. Sorensen, effective January 11. 2010. On November 8, 2010, Dr. Sorensen's privileges were restored with restrictions.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 10 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 10 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., November 10, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints
            and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Ronald Bjorndahl Sorensen:

            (1)   Dr. Sorensen shall practise under the guidance of a clinical
                  supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor(s)"),
                  who must execute the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached
                  hereto as Appendix "B" to this Order, and who will, at a minimum: 

                        (i)   Meet with Dr. Sorensen at his Practice Location (as defined
                              below), or another location approved by the College, once
                              every two weeks;
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least twenty (20) of Dr. Sorensen's patient charts
                              at every meeting, which shall be selected by the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) independently of Dr. Sorensen, on the basis of
                              the areas of concern identified in the medical inspector's
                              reports, received on September 13, 2017 and October 5, 2017,
                              any other materials provided by the College, and any concerns
                              that arise during the period of Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (iii) Pre-operatively review with Dr. Sorensen any cases in which
                              Dr. Sorensen proposes to perform GreenLight Laser
                              Prostatectomy, in order to determine whether the procedure is
                              in the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s view warranted, and if so,
                              provide approval to Dr. Sorensen to proceed with the approved
                              procedure, which approval shall be noted in the patient chart
                              and in the Log (defined below); 
                  
                        (iv)  Observe Dr. Sorensen in the course of all GreenLight Laser
                              Prostatectomies which Dr. Sorensen performs;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews,
                              observation, and pre-operative reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to Dr. Sorensen as the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) believes necessary or desirable in order to
                              maintain the standard of practice of the profession and to
                              protect patients from exposure to harm or injury, and follow
                              up on such recommendations to determine whether Dr. Sorensen
                              has followed them;
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents,
                              including but not limited to the Log (defined below), or
                              conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deems necessary to the Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month.
                  
            (2)   Dr. Sorensen must cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of his
                  practice, conducted under the terms of the Order, including Appendix "B"
                  attached, and must abide by the recommendations of his Clinical
                  Supervisor(s).

            (3)   Dr. Sorensen shall not perform any GreenLight Laser Prostatectomy,
                  without first obtaining express approval from a Clinical Supervisor(s)
                  under section (1)(iii) above to do so. For greater certainty, this shall
                  be the case from the time that this Order is effective, notwithstanding
                  whether the time period under section (5) below has yet elapsed.

            (4)   Dr. Sorensen shall permit the Clinical Supervisor(s) to observe all Green
                  Light Laser Prostatectomies that he performs, and shall facilitate
                  observation;

            (5)   Dr. Sorensen must ensure that Appendix "B" to this Order, is signed and
                  delivered to the College within seven (7) days of the date this Order is
                  effective. 

            (6)   If a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "B" to this Order is
                  unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, Dr. Sorensen
                  shall, within seven (7) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an
                  executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person
                  who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                  College within that time.

            (7)   If Dr. Sorensen is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor as set out
                  under sections (5) and/or (6) above, he shall cease practising medicine
                  until such time as he has obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to
                  the College, and this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on
                  his Certificate of Registration, to be included on the public Register.  

            (8)   Dr. Sorensen shall maintain a log of GreenLight Laser Prostatectomies
                  that he performs, indicating the date and time when approval was received
                  from his Clinical Supervisor(s) to perform the procedure, the date of the
                  procedure, and patient identifying information, as well as any proposed
                  GreenLight Laser Prostatectomies proposed by Dr. Sorensen but not
                  approved by the Clinical Supervisor(s) (the "Log").

            (9)   Dr. Sorensen shall provide a copy of the Log to the College once per
                  month, and shall maintain the original Log for inspection by the College
                  and review by the Clinical Supervisor(s). 

            (10)  Dr. Sorensen shall inform the College of each and every location where he
                  practises or has privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively his "Practice
                  Location(s)"), within five (5) days of the date of this Order.  Going
                  forward, Dr. Sorensen shall inform the College of any and all new
                  Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                  location.

            (11)  Dr. Sorensen shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Location(s) and patient charts and and to any
                  other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor his
                  compliance with the provisions of this Order.

            (12)  Dr. Sorensen shall give his irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the making of this
                        Order;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, his practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of his compliance with
                        this Order.
                  
            (13)  Dr. Sorensen shall give his irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff") with any information the
                  College has that led to the making of this Order and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of his compliance with this Order.

            (14)  Dr. Sorensen shall give his irrevocable consent to all Clinical
                  Supervisors and Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Order;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s
                        undertaking set out at Appendix "B"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring his compliance with this
                        Order. 
                  
            (15)  Dr. Sorensen shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order,
                  provide to the College his irrevocable consent in the form attached at
                  Appendix "C" for the College to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario
                  Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP") to monitor his compliance with the terms
                  of this Order.

            (16)  Dr. Sorensen shall be responsible for payment of all fees, costs,
                  charges, and expenses arising from the implementation of this Order.