Sorg, Michael Konrad (CPSO#: 81192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cochrane Allergy Clinic
208 Third Ave
Cochrane AB  T4C 1A7
Phone: 403-981-3232
Fax: 403-538-6751
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sorg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 13 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 03 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL KONRAD SORG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SORG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2008