Sorge, Cindy Renee (CPSO#: 82985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210B
325 West street
Brantford ON  N3R 3V6
Phone: (226) 730-0011
Fax: (226) 730-0012
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cindy Sorge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sorge ( CPSO# 82985 )

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
Suite 210B
325 West Street
Brantford ON  N3R 3V6
Phone Number: (226) 730-0011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY RENEE SORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SORGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010