Sorhaindo, Arlene Ann (CPSO#: 70763)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Nov 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 05 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 06 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 05 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 06 Aug 1998 to 05 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 06 Aug 1999 to 15 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 1999