Soriano, Samuel (CPSO#: 22801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Jan 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#258
2155 Leanne Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5K 2K8
Phone: (905) 823-8482
Fax: (905) 823-9848
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2000
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Oct 2001

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 11 Oct 2001 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 11, 2001, Dr. Samuel Soriano, undertakes that:

            1.    He will not perform surgical procedures.

            2.    He will not treat fractures that require closed reductions.

            3.    He   will  not  apply  for hospital privileges at any hospital in Ontario
                  where he does not currently  have  an  appointment  and  not  change  his
                  appointment  from  Courtesy  Medical  Staff  at Southlake Regional Health
                  Centre  (formerly  York  County  Hospital) without  first  notifying  and
                  providing  written  reasons for the  request  to  the  Quality  Assurance
                  Committee of the College  of  Physicians  and Surgeons of Ontario no less
                  than two months prior to making the request to the hospital(s).

            4.    Should he wish to modify the terms, conditions and limitations set out in
                  paragraphs 1, 2, or 3 of this undertaking,  he  will  notify  the Quality
                  Assurance Committee  and:

                  a)    participate  in a physician review program approved by the  Quality
                        Assurance Committee  to  evaluate  his  medical  knowledge,  skill,
                        judgement and clinical performance in those areas of medicine  that
                        he wishes to practise;
                  
                  b)    receive a category 1 or 2 on his physician review program; and 
                  
                  c)    comply  with  all recommendations made as a result of his physician
                        review  program   evaluation,   which   may   include   educational
                        activities,  direct supervision of his practice and/or restrictions
                        on his continued practice.