Soric, Rajka (CPSO#: 51818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Zagreb, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Park Hospital
Ruddy Building
R3 10
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone: (416) 243-3685
Fax: (416) 243-1177
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajka Soric Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Soric ( CPSO# 51818 )

Business Address:
West Park Hospital
Ruddy Building
R3-10
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone Number: (416) 243-3685

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJKA SORIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SORIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 May 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1986