Sorisky, Alexander Martin (CPSO#: 53141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Endocrinology and Metabolism
4th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 88333
Fax: (613) 738-8261
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Vermont

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 11 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER MARTIN SORISKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SORISKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1983