Soroka, Dana Joy (CPSO#: 68034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
5th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7480
Fax: (416) 867-7478
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-7460
Fax: (416) 867-7478
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Soroka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soroka ( CPSO# 68034 )

Business Address:
61 Queen Street East
4th & 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-7460

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA JOY SOROKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOROKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999