Sorrento, Vito Anthony (CPSO#: 70400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4600 Highway 7 West
Suite 180
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-3330
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health- Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-2041
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vito Sorrento Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sorrento ( CPSO# 70400 )

Business Address:
4600 Highway 7 West
Suite 180
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-3330

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2041

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VITO ANTHONY SORRENTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SORRENTO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1999