Sottosanti, Maria (CPSO#: 84601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301-510 southdale rd e
london ontario
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone: (519) 6902806 Ext. ext 5
Fax: (519) 690-0970
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1653 richmond st
London ON  N6G0V1
Canada
Phone: 5198503800
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

301-510 southdale road E
London ON  N6E0B2
Canada
Phone: 5196902806 Ext. 5
Fax: 5196900970
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Sottosanti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sottosanti ( CPSO# 84601 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital Western Ont
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 658-8500

Business Address:
Suite 301
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone Number: (519) 690-2806

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA SOTTOSANTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOTTOSANTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2010