Soucy, Elaine (CPSO#: 68768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 607-8334
Fax: (905) 607-8184
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE SOUCY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUCY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1997